CHARITY OF HUMPHREY CHILTON HOWARD FRANCIS

Charity number: 900641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 March 2020 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 February 2020 483 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required