Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 18/02/1921
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/07/1929
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/11/1929
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/10/1932
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/07/1939
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/1957
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/07/1968
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/07/1971
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/06/1981
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/07/1982
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/09/1985
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/07/1992
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/1997
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/07/2001
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/07/2004
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/07/2005
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/08/2008
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/01/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13 AUG 2014
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 JUN 2020
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE HOMES OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION; EITHER FURNISHED OR UNFURNISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2 TO ASSIST FINANCIALLY BY GRANT PERSONS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE. 3 TO PROVIDE/ADAPT ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED).