Linked charity 201486-2 MATTHEW SILLESBY
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 JANUARY 1882 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 30 JULY 1915, 6 DECEMBER 1927 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 1928 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
ANNUITIES TO POOR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS NEXT PRECEDING TIME OF ELECTION. (PREFERENCE TO PESONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS.)
Area of benefit
Registration history