Linked charity 201486-6 BUGBROOKE OR 29TH MAY CHARITY
Governing document
INDENTURES DATED 1 JANUARY 1755 AND 2 JANUARY 1755. SCHEMES OF 4 FEBRUARY 1879 AND 30 JULY 1915 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
CLOTHING FOR POOR FREEMEN OF THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON.
Area of benefit
Registration history