INTER-VARSITY FELLOWSHIP OF EVANGELICAL UNIONS

Charity number: 306137-1
Linked charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 APRIL 1928 AS AMENDED ON 05 APRIL 1941, 28 MARCH 1942, 31 MARCH 1954, 11 SEPTEMBER 1954 AND 02 APRIL 1960.
Charitable objects
TO CO-ORDINATE THE WORK AND TO UNITE THE MEMBERS OF THE EVANGELICAL UNIONS IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE FELLOWSHIP.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 25 September 1962 : registered
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of