THE TERRIER TRUST

Charity number: 1050480
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE ACQUISITION, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, OF ONE OR MORE LOCOMOTIVES OF THE "TERRIER" CLASS DESIGNED BY WILLIAM STROUDLEY FOR THE FORMER LONDON BRIGHTON & SOUTH COAST RAILWAY AND TO FACILITATE THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, OPERATION AND THE EXHIBITION OF SUCH LOCOMOTIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 10 November 1995 : registered
  • 01 August 2018 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information