CROPWOOD OUTDOOR TRUST

Charity number: 517997
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/09/1986 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/1991 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE THE PUPILS AT THE CROPWOOD OUTDOOR CENTRE TRUST THROUGH THEIR SCHOOL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 07 October 1986 : registered
  • 25 January 2018 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • CROPWOOD OUTDOOR CENTRE TRUST (Working name)
  • CROPWOOD OUTDOOR CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS' OF OAKDALE (Previous name)
  • OAKDALE CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services