FREEWHEELERS EMERGENCY VOLUNTARY SERVICE (WESTON)

Charity number: 1001067
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 20 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)