FAMOUS TRAINS MODEL RAILWAY

Charity number: 1126173
Charity reporting is 659 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 Not yet received
294 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not yet received
294 days overdue
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not yet received
659 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not yet received
659 days overdue
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 26 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)