WORLD OBESITY FEDERATION

Charity number: 1076981
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 December 2019 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 December 2019 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 November 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 November 2018 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

22 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)