THE AGAINST MALARIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1105319
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 03 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)