OPTIMUM POPULATION TRUST

Charity number: 1114109
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 01 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 February 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 20 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 19 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)