CROSSROADS IN HERTFORDSHIRE (NORTH AND NORTHEAST) CARING FOR CARERS

Charity number: 1121629
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)