LILIAN FAITHFULL CARE

Charity number: 1122183
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)