MASONIC HALL IPSWICH LTD

Charity number: 1130452
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

( These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 01 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 07 October 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)