SAVE THE ORANGUTAN

Charity number: 1133204
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 December 2017 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 December 2017 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)