THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, DORCHESTER ON THAMES

Charity number: 1133787
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 12 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)