THE MAYOR OF LONDON'S FUND FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity number: 1141216
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 22 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 12 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)