BESPOKE SUPPORTIVE TENANCIES LTD

Charity number: 1143046
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 August 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 15 August 2019 16 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 06 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 22 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 25 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 25 May 2016 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)