GAY-GLOS

Charity number: 1149572
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 February 2017 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 February 2016 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)