OPERATION ENCOMPASS

Charity number: 1169147
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)