FRIENDS OF MARTELLO24

Charity number: 1172376
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)