WILLIAM ADLINGTON CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 213629
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)