ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

( These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)