HACKNEY ALLOTMENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294128
Charity reporting is 183 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not yet received
183 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not yet received
183 days overdue
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 10 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)