SOUTHAMPTON MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 299426
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 November 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 November 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 November 2016 3 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)