BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1151841
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 23 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 05 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 15 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 23 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)