THE NIRVANA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1104214
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 August 2020 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 August 2020 199 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 February 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 May 2018 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)