BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1085815
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 10 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 10 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)