DAISIE RICH TRUST

Charity number: 236706
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 04 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 02 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)