FINANCIAL MARKETS LAW COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1164902
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 27 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 15 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 10 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 10 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 16 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 16 August 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)