GLOBALTEER

Charity number: 1119706
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

( These accounts
have been qualified)

16 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 18 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 18 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 23 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 23 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)