INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' WELFARE AND ASSISTANCE NETWORK

Charity number: 1102946
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 25 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 25 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)