Accounts and annual returns LONDON TOPOGRAPHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 271590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window