THE NORTHAM CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1081784
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 13 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 10 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)