WILFRED JACKSON WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1148433
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 01 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)