BORDER TERRIER WELFARE

Charity number: 1116853
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 11 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 21 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)