CHARLIE AND KATHLEEN DUNNERY CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1104342
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)