GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)

Charity number: 207736
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)