DONATE4REFUGEES

Charity number: 1168435
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 19 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 25 April 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)