THE INSTITUTE OF DEVELOPMENT STUDIES

Charity number: 306371
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)