ISLAMIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122086
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 29 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 29 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2015 06 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 25 September 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)