KRISHNAMURTI FOUNDATION TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312865
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 07 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 17 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 12 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)