Accounts and annual returns LOVE SIERRA LEONE

Charity number: 1157847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window