MIDLANDS AIR AMBULANCE CHARITY

Charity number: 1143118
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)