ONE PLUS ONE MARRIAGE AND PARTNERSHIP RESEARCH

Charity number: 1087994
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 August 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)