THE ROCK ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158478
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 July 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)