RSPCA Burton upon Trent & District Branch

Charity number: 232234
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)