THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, RIVERHEAD WITH DUNTON GREEN

Charity number: 1128522
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)