THE STEEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 272384
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 31 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 05 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)